MA S2850 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to municipal matters.
Title
Municipalities and Regional Government - Extension Order
Sponsors
Sen. John Cronin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | House | Adopted, in concurrence |
2022-06-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Adopted, as amended |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Cronin) adopted |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2757 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2689 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - House adopted, in concurrence
S2689 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - House adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2850 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2850.pdf |