MA S2858 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2818
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Westport to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk off the premises, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2858).
Title
Authorizing the town of Westport to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk off the premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-09-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-09-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-08-12 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-11 | Senate | New draft of S2818 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2818 (Replaces) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2858
S2497 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2860
S2441 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2859
S2380 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3741
S2567 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2497 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2860
S2441 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2859
S2380 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3741
S2567 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2858 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2858.pdf |