MA S2875 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2817
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to an easement in Lynn, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2875).
Title
Relative to an easement in Lynn
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Peter Capano [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] |
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-05 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #476 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #476 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 469) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-01-05 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-01-04 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-04 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2021-01-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 5228 |
2020-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-31 | Senate | New draft of S2817 |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2817 (Replaces) 2020-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2875
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2875.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/191/SenateRollCall476.pdf |