MA S2913 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2964
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to real estate tax abatements to help businesses impacted by the Phase IV reopening plan. Revenue.
Title
Relative to real estate tax abatements to help businesses impacted by the Phase IV reopening plan
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [D] |
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2964 |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-10-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday November 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2020 from 04:30 PM-06:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-09-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2964 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2913 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2913.pdf |