MA S292 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4537
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the definition of personal care attendant. [Children, Familes and Persons with Disabilities].
Title
To clarify the definition of a personal care attendant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4537 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2012-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4537 (Replaced by) 2012-12-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S292 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12230&generalCourtId=1 |