MA S2987 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2982
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Kathryn Price, an employee of the department of mental health, reports recommending that the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2987).
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Kathryn Price, an employee of the department of mental health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2021-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-01-06 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-01-04 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-12-23 | Senate | New draft of S2982 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2982 (Replaces) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2987
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2987 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2987.pdf |