MA S2991 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt all positions in the police department of the town of Dalton from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local approval received]
Title
Exempting all positions in the police department of the town of Dalton from the civil service law
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-11 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
H2690 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2717 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3864 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2022
H4233 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2022
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
H3810 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2690 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2717 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3864 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2022
H4233 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2022
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
H3810 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2991 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2991.pdf |