MA H2717 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the membership of the Forensic Science Oversight Board. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the size of the Forensic Science Oversight Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2686 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S476 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H420 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4510
S1737 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2751
H3378 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 266 of the Acts of 2022
H3231 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1715 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2176 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S476 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H420 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4510
S1737 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2751
H3378 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 266 of the Acts of 2022
H3231 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1715 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2176 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2717 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2717.pdf |