MA S3015 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 229 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 229 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to designating certain portions of Interstate Highway Route 495 as the Susannah North Martin Highway
Title
Relative to designating certain portions of Interstate Highway Route 495 as the Susannah North Martin Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 229 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-09-22 | House | Enacted |
2022-09-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-08-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-08-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-08-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-19 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2318 |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Recommended new draft (DiZoglio) for S2318 |
Same As/Similar To
S2318 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - New draft substituted (DiZoglio), see S3015
S2449 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2021
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
S2448 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - New draft substituted, see S3133
S2449 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2021
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
S2448 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - New draft substituted, see S3133
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3015 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3015.pdf |