MA S3097 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2584
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing barriers to care for mental health
Title
Addressing barriers to care for mental health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Senate conference committee report Roll Call #260 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-08-01 | House | Enacted |
2022-08-01 | House | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2022-08-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-08-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2022-08-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted -see Roll Call #260 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Reported on S2584 |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Reported by committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
S2584 (Replaced by) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
S1276 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
H4879 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Published as amended, see H4891
H4891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - H4879, published as amended
S1276 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
H4879 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Published as amended, see H4891
H4891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - H4879, published as amended
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3097 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3097.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall260.pdf |