MA S1276 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S675
Note: Legislation replaced by S2572
Note: Legislation replaced by S2572
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to address barriers to care for mental health. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Addressing barriers to care for mental health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2572 |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Read second |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, November 17, 2021 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2572 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Accompanied by S675 and S1288 |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1010 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S675 (Replaces) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S2572 (Replaced by) 2021-11-17 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2584
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4879 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Published as amended, see H4891
H4891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - H4879, published as amended
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1010 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S675 (Replaces) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S2572 (Replaced by) 2021-11-17 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2584
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4879 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Published as amended, see H4891
H4891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - H4879, published as amended
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1276 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1276.pdf |