MA S3133 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the charter of the city of Amesbury
Title
Amending the charter of the city of Amesbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-08 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-11-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-11-02 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Substituted for S2448 |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Recommended new draft (DiZoglio) for S2448 |
Same As/Similar To
S2448 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - New draft substituted, see S3133
H3823 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied S2448
H5370 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 408 of the Acts of 2022
S831 (Similar To) 2021-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2547
S2318 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - New draft substituted (DiZoglio), see S3015
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H5409 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2449 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2021
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
H3824 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied S2449
H3823 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied S2448
H5370 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 408 of the Acts of 2022
S831 (Similar To) 2021-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2547
S2318 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - New draft substituted (DiZoglio), see S3015
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H5409 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2449 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2021
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
H3824 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied S2449
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3133 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3133.pdf |