MA S3146 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the powers of the town of Brookline to delegate licensing authority
Title
Expanding the powers of the town of Brookline to delegate licensing authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-12-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-12-04 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Substituted for S2684 |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Creem) for S2684 |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S3147 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
S2684 (Similar To) 2022-12-01 - New draft (Creem) substituted, see S3146
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S3147 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
S2684 (Similar To) 2022-12-01 - New draft (Creem) substituted, see S3146
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3146 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3146.pdf |