MA S336 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the public health of citizens of the Commonwealth through the testing and labeling of striped bass [Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture].
Title
Promoting the public health of the citizens of the Commonwealth through the testing and labeling of striped bass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-19 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2012-02-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S336 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9732&generalCourtId=1 |