MA S347 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2347
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2347
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2347
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to interagency collaboration for dropout prevention. Education.
Title
Relative to interagency collaboration for dropout prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2347 |
2015-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2347 (Replaced by) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S283 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S251 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2173 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2363
S208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S99 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S283 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S251 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2173 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2363
S208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S99 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S347 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S347.pdf |