MA S348 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2663
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to parental notification in public schools. Education.
Title
Relative to parental notification in public schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2663 |
2023-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H509 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4587
H544 (Similar To) 2023-10-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3764 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
S2663 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H544 (Similar To) 2023-10-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3764 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
S2663 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S348 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S348.pdf |