MA S357 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H607
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the personal care allowance of residents of long-term care facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
Increasing the personal needs allowance for residents of long term care facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Accompanied by H607 |
2019-04-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1687 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S69 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1702 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1302 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3000 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1643 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H607 (Replaces) 2019-05-13 - Accompanied S357
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S69 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1702 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1302 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3000 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1643 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H607 (Replaces) 2019-05-13 - Accompanied S357
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S357 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S357.pdf |