MA S358 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to home care. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to home care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday January 5, 2021, pending concurrence |
2020-07-07 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday, August 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday March 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1598 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1063 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2311
H96 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1692 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S986 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1063 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2311
H96 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1692 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S986 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S358 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S358.pdf |