MA S364 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission on innovative technology-enabled teaching and learning. Education.
Title
To establish a special commission on innovative technology-enabled teaching and learning
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2721 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H4089 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1448 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H5046 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Published as amended, see H5076
S3084 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H2721 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H4089 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1448 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H5046 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Published as amended, see H5076
S3084 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S364 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S364.pdf |