MA S381 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve Massachusetts home care. Elder Affairs.
Title
To improve Massachusetts home care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday January 5, 2021, pending concurrence |
2020-07-07 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday, August 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday March 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H624 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S364
S364 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2721 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
S2044 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S364 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2721 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
S2044 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S381 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S381.pdf |