MA S396 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to election day registration. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to election day registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1332 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2863
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H656 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3128 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S406 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H244 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1773 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3135 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1332 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2863
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H656 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3128 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S406 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H244 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1773 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3135 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S396 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S396.pdf |