MA S427 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to fairly fund early voting. Election Laws.
Title
To fairly fund early voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2544 |
2019-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3492 (Similar To) 2020-03-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H684 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3107 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H436 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2244 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2020 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1823 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S2195 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2019
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
H684 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3107 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H436 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2244 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2020 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1823 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S2195 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2019
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S427 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S427.pdf |