MA S2544 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to grant noncitizen permanent residents in the town of Warwick the right to vote in municipal elections, report the accompanying Order (Senate, No.2544).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Election Laws to make an investigation and study of certain current Senate documents relative to election laws issues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-13 | Senate | Reported (in part) by S416 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported (in part) by S2290 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied by S382, S383, S384, S385, S387, S388, S390, S391, S392, S393, S394, S395, S397, S398, S400, S401, S402, S403, S405, S406, S407, S409, S410, S411, S412, S413, S415, S416, S417, S418, S419, S420, S421, S422, S423, S424, S425, S426, S427, S428, S2290 and S2291 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S382 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S383 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S384 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S385 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S387 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S388 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S390 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S391 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S392 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S393 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S394 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S395 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S397 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S398 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S400 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S401 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S402 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S403 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S405 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S406 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S407 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S409 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S410 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S411 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S412 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S413 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S415 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S416 (Replaces) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S2632
S417 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S418 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S419 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S420 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S421 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S422 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S423 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S424 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S425 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S426 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S427 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S428 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2290 (Replaces) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2291 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S383 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S384 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S385 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S387 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S388 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S390 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S391 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S392 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S393 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S394 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S395 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S397 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S398 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S400 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S401 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S402 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S403 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S405 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S406 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S407 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S409 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S410 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S411 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S412 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S413 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S415 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S416 (Replaces) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S2632
S417 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S418 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S419 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S420 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S421 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S422 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S423 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S424 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S425 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S426 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S427 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S428 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2290 (Replaces) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2291 (Replaces) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2544 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2544.pdf |