MA S427 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2655
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2655
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2655
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the representation on board of registrars. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to the board of registrars
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2655 |
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S1646 (Similar To) 2024-06-26 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S2023 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H133 (Similar To) 2023-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1017 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
S2655 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4639 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2023 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H133 (Similar To) 2023-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1017 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
S2655 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4639 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S427 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S427.pdf |