MA S431 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to family visitation with a vulnerable adult. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to family visitation with a vulnerable adult
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2650 |
2021-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1867 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H2930 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2849 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S411 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2650 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2773 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H2930 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2849 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S411 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2650 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2773 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S431 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S431.pdf |