MA S432 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the use of shotguns during bear hunting season. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the use of shotguns
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied S446 |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S446 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S429 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2249
S430 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S445 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
H469 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
S429 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2249
S430 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S445 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
H469 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S432 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S432.pdf |