MA S46 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H182
Note: Legislation replaced by S2541
Note: Legislation replaced by S2541
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-13 - Pending new draft substituted, see S02541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-13 - Pending new draft substituted, see S02541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation to create a special commission on behavior modification
Title
Create a special commission on behavior modification
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-13 | Pending new draft substituted, see S02541 | |
2010-07-13 | Read second | |
2010-07-13 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | |
2010-07-12 | Referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-07-12 | Motion to suspend rules negatived | |
2010-07-12 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2541 | |
2010-07-07 | Referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-07-07 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-07 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-07-01 | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-03-11 | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | |
2010-03-11 | Accompanied by H182 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 10/27 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H182 (Replaces) 2010-03-11 - Accompanied S46
S2541 (Replaced by) 2010-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means
S2541 (Replaced by) 2010-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s00046.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st00/st00046.htm |