MA S46 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to eliminate archaic language pertaining to individuals with disabilities
Title
Eliminating archaic language pertaining to individuals with disabilities in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Sen. Karen Spilka [D] |
Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S46 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14715&generalCourtId=1 |