MA S462 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2380
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the safety and reclamation of quarries. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the safety and reclamation of quarries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2380 |
2015-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-05-28 | Joint | Hearing on 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 cancelled |
2015-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2380 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S333 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S189 (Similar To) 2015-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S970 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1818 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2515 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S507 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S508 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
S2520 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Ordered to a third reading
S2522 (Similar To) -
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
H531 (Similar To) 2016-01-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1813 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1786 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1767 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1031 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S484 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1123 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S333 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S189 (Similar To) 2015-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S970 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1818 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2515 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S507 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S508 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
S2520 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Ordered to a third reading
S2522 (Similar To) -
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
H531 (Similar To) 2016-01-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1813 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1786 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1767 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1031 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S484 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1123 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S462 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S462.pdf |