MA S47 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a task force to protect Massachusetts children against child sexual abuse. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Creating a task force to protect Massachusetts children against child sexual abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Katherine Clark [D] | Sen. Brian Joyce [D] | Sen. Barry Finegold [D] | Rep. Thomas Conroy [D] |
Sen. Eileen Donoghue [D] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S47 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S47.pdf |