MA S477 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - New draft substituted, see S2293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - New draft substituted, see S2293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to patient financial protection. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to patient financial protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2293 |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2293 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, see S2096 and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2293 (Replaced by) 2014-07-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S477 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S477.pdf |