MA S478 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3553
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to vegetation management. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to vegetation management
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] | Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Brian Mannal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied by H3553 |
2015-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3553 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S478
S755 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S744 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H821 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4760
H2988 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S659 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
H3754 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S755 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S744 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H821 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4760
H2988 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S659 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
H3754 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S478 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S478.pdf |