MA S486 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4070
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4070
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4070
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation concerning Medicaid and accountable care. Health Care Financing.
Title
Concerning Medicaid and accountable care
Sponsors
Sen. Gale Candaras [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4070 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4070 (Replaced by) 2012-12-31 - Reported, in part, by H4561
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S486 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14402&generalCourtId=1 |