MA S493 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the George L. Darey Inland Fisheries and Game Fund. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to the George L. Darey Inland Fisheries and Game Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2649 |
2023-11-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S499 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1072 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S2649 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1072 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S2649 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S493 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S493.pdf |