MA S498 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to risk management services. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to risk management services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2318 |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2318 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H892 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H3540 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S283 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1675 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H892 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H3540 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S283 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1675 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S498 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S498.pdf |