MA S520 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H798
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to recycling. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Accompanied by S494, S498 and H798 |
2019-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S470 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H750 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S494 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H796 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H798 (Replaces) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S470 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H750 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S494 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H796 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H798 (Replaces) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S520 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S520.pdf |