MA H796 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the recycling of certain paints. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to paint recycling
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] |
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H750 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2830 (Similar To) 2020-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H797 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H798 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S470 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S494 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H750 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2830 (Similar To) 2020-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H797 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H798 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S470 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S494 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H796.pdf |