MA S57 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public assistance for working families and the creation of a pilot program to address the impacts of the cliff effect. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Concerning public assistance for working families and the creation of a pilot program to address the impacts of the cliff effect
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. James Welch [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday September 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 18, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S221 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S2046 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S847 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H174 (Similar To) 2020-09-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S221 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S2046 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S847 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H174 (Similar To) 2020-09-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S57 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S57.pdf |