MA S589 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a cranberry wetland mitigation bank. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to a cranberry wetland mitigation bank
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Rep. William Straus [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3075 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1940 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4934
S1940 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4934
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S589 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S589.pdf |