MA S596 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use of interactive audio, video or other electronic media for the purpose of medical diagnosis, consultation or treatment. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to full application of telemedicine coverage
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H960 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H960 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S596 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S596.pdf |