MA S606 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2660
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote continuity of care for multiple sclerosis treatment. Financial Services.
Title
Promoting continuity of care for multiple sclerosis treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2660 |
2019-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H730 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
H222 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1751 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H96 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2660 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
H222 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1751 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H96 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2660 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S606 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S606.pdf |