MA S61 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2683
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to review advancements in educational technology, digital/online learning and related programs. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission to review advancements in educational technology, digital/online learning and related programs in order to provide the Administration, the Legislature, Municipalities and all other interested parties with the most current research and information concerning educational technology and content to assess the feasibility of state, local and private educational systems adopting, implementing or integrating current technology to enhance and improve the educational experience for students and educational professionals while reducing costs for the citizens of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2683 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
Same As/Similar To
H249 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
H4089 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H637 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2022
S2683 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5046 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Published as amended, see H5076
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
H4089 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H637 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2022
S2683 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5046 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Published as amended, see H5076
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S61 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S61.pdf |