MA S703 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require mental health parity for disability policies. Financial Services.
Title
Requiring mental health parity for disability policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred (Friedman) to the committee on Joint Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-04-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S731 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
H2710 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4508
H4508 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2710 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4508
H4508 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S703 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S703.pdf |