MA S703 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2636
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to reduce racial and socioeconomic inequities in auto insurance premium pricing. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to reducing racial and socioeconomic inequities in auto insurance premium pricing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2636 |
2023-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2636 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S703 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S703.pdf |