MA S729 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2693
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to health purchasing cooperatives. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to health purchasing cooperatives
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2693 |
2021-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H4084 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2021
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2652 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
S1429 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1693 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S634 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2693 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H4084 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2021
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2652 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
S1429 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1693 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S634 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2693 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S729 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S729.pdf |