MA S730 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a low-income sewer and water assistance program. Housing.
Title
To provide sewer and water rate relief
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-08-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/22/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S454 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S37 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S776 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S719 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2401
S749 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H84 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1536 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H3008 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H4120 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S37 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S776 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S719 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2401
S749 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H84 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1536 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H3008 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H4120 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S730 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S730.pdf |