MA S738 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2583
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect pregnant and postpartum patients. Health Care Financing.
Title
Protecting pregnant and postpartum patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2583 |
2021-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S763 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S762
S127 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2583 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2731
H1759 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S978 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3683 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S127 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2583 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2731
H1759 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S978 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3683 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S738 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S738.pdf |