MA S75 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2661
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for diaper changing stations in public buildings and accommodations. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Providing for diaper changing stations in public buildings and accommodations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2661 |
2019-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1870 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1337 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S1826 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2661 (Replaced by) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1337 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S1826 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2661 (Replaced by) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S75 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S75.pdf |