MA S750 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove the requirement to provide notice to the department of mental health of a license granted to a guardian to sell real estate. The Judiciary.
Title
Removing the requirement to provide notice to the department of mental health of a license granted to a guardian to sell real estate
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S750 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S750.pdf |