MA S758 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to permit the court to expunge the record of persons struggling with substance abuse or charged with possession of certain Class D controlled substances. The Judiciary.
Title
Permitting the court to expunge the record of persons struggling with substance abuse or charged with possession of certain Class D controlled substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S879 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S962 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S903 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S880 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S767 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1700 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2268 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S927 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S926 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H928 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S962 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S903 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S880 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S767 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1700 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2268 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S927 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S926 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H928 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S758 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S758.pdf |